EP4366083 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Change - classification | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | 03.10.2024 | Change - classification | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JO, Jaehoon Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Hosaeng Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
PARK, Seongjin Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
YUN, Sumin Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 05 /
JANG, Woomin Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 06 /
JONG, Jehun Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 07 /
JUNG, Jinwoo Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/19] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2024/19] | Application number, filing date | 22833661.6 | 30.06.2022 | [2024/19] | WO2022KR09409 | Priority number, date | KR20210087133 | 02.07.2021 Original published format: KR 20210087133 | [2024/19] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023277607 | Date: | 05.01.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4366083 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/24, H01Q9/28, H01Q9/04, H04M1/02, H01Q21/08, H01Q25/00 | [2024/45] | CPC: |
H01Q1/243 (EP,KR);
H01Q21/065 (US);
H01Q21/08 (EP);
H01Q25/00 (EP);
H01Q9/0407 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q9/285 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2024/19] | H01Q1/24, H01Q9/28, H01Q9/04, H04M1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT ANTENNE | [2024/19] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING ANTENNA | [2024/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE COMPRENANT UNE ANTENNE | [2024/19] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2024 | Translation filed | 02.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 02.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR20190119954 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20200007377 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20200028256 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]WO2020177846 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al); | [A]US2020403316 (DALMIA SIDHARTH [US], et al) |