EP4363549 - STACKABLE PLATES FOR CULTURING TISSUE MODELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mattek Corporation 200 Homer Avenue Ashland, MA 01721 / US | [2024/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLAUSNER, Mitchell Ashland, Massachusetts 01721 / US | 02 /
AYEHUNIE, Seyoum Ashland, Massachusetts 01721 / US | 03 /
KEARNEY, Paul Ashland, Massachusetts 01721 / US | 04 /
ARMENTO, Alex Ashland, Massachusetts 01721 / US | [2024/19] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2024/19] | Application number, filing date | 22833970.1 | 27.06.2022 | [2024/19] | WO2022US35041 | Priority number, date | US202163215892P | 28.06.2021 Original published format: US 202163215892 P | US202163215895P | 28.06.2021 Original published format: US 202163215895 P | [2024/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023278285 | Date: | 05.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4363549 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/14, C12M1/18, C12M3/00 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
C12M21/08 (EP);
C12M23/12 (EP);
C12M25/04 (EP);
C12N5/0062 (EP);
C12N5/0068 (EP);
C12N5/0679 (EP);
C12N2533/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] | Title | German: | STAPELBARE PLATTEN ZUR KULTIVIERUNG VON GEWEBEMODELLEN | [2024/19] | English: | STACKABLE PLATES FOR CULTURING TISSUE MODELS | [2024/19] | French: | PLAQUES EMPILABLES POUR LA CULTURE DE MODÈLES DE TISSUS | [2024/19] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5554536 (RISING DONALD B [US]); | [Y]US2010190197 (MARTIN GREGORY R [US], et al); | [Y]WO2020109865 (NOVARTIS AG [CH]) |