Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4363041 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP22834277 JP2023580399 US2022035856W US202217855415



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2023001169Global Dossier 05.01.2023A1
Priority number Date
US202163217083 30.06.2021
US202217855415 30.06.2022
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2024522909Global Dossier 21.06.2024A
Priority number Date
US202163217083 30.06.2021
WO2022US35856 30.06.2022
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4363041Global Dossier 08.05.2024A1
Priority number Date
US202163217083 30.06.2021
WO2022US35856 30.06.2022
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2023278795Global Dossier 05.01.2023A1
Priority number Date
US202163217083 30.06.2021