EP4364082 - ATTRIBUTE CODING IN GEOMETRY POINT CLOUD CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/19] | For all designated states Innopeak Technology, Inc. 2479 E. Bayshore Road, Ste. 110 Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Yue Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 02 /
YU, Haoping Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 03 /
ZAKHARCHENKO, Vladyslav Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | [2024/19] | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2024/19] | Application number, filing date | 22834300.0 | 01.07.2022 | [2024/19] | WO2022US35927 | Priority number, date | US202163218125P | 02.07.2021 Original published format: US 202163218125 P | US202163264509P | 23.11.2021 Original published format: US 202163264509 P | [2024/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023278829 | Date: | 05.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4364082 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06T3/40, G06T9/00, G06T17/20 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
G06T9/004 (EP);
H04N19/593 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ATTRIBUTCODIERUNG IN GEOMETRIEPUNKTWOLKENCODIERUNG | [2024/19] | English: | ATTRIBUTE CODING IN GEOMETRY POINT CLOUD CODING | [2024/19] | French: | CODAGE D'ATTRIBUT DANS UN CODAGE EN NUAGE À POINT GÉOMÉTRIQUE | [2024/19] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2013297574 (THIYANARATNAM PRADEEP [US]) [A] 1-40 * entire document *; | [A]US2017214943 (COHEN ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-40 * entire document *; | [A]US2020311984 (YEA SEHOON [US], et al) [A] 1-40 * entire document *; | [A]US2020380760 (VOSOUGHI ARASH [US], et al) [A] 1-40 * entire document *; | [PX]US2021407144 (RAMASUBRAMONIAN ADARSH KRISHNAN [US], et al) [PX] 1-40* entire document *; | [A] - Graziosi D., Nakagami O., Kuma S., Zaghetto A., Suzuki T., Tabatabai A., "An overview of ongoing point cloud compression standardization activities: video-based (V-PCC) and geometry-based (G-PCC)", APSIPA Transactions on Signal and Information Processing, (20200101), vol. 9, no. 1, doi:10.1017/ATSIP.2020.12, ISSN 2048-7703, XP093012170 [A] 1-40 * entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1017/ATSIP.2020.12 | [A] - Yan Huang, Jingliang Peng, Kuo C.-C.J., Gopi M., "A Generic Scheme for Progressive Point Cloud Coding", IEEE Transactions on Visualization and Computer Graphics, IEEE, USA, USA, (20080301), vol. 14, no. 2, doi:10.1109/TVCG.2007.70441, ISSN 1077-2626, pages 440 - 453, XP055806302 [A] 1-40 * entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TVCG.2007.70441 |