EP4368670 - CURABLE COMPOSITION, CURED PRODUCT, COATING AGENT, AND CONCRETE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 3-18, Nakanoshima 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | [2024/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANO, Ayako Takasago-shi, Hyogo 676-8688 / JP | 02 /
SAKABE, Masaomi Takasago-shi, Hyogo 676-8688 / JP | [2024/20] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2024/20] | Application number, filing date | 22837465.8 | 21.06.2022 | [2024/20] | WO2022JP24631 | Priority number, date | JP20210111413 | 05.07.2021 Original published format: JP 2021111413 | [2024/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023282048 | Date: | 12.01.2023 | Language: | JA | [2023/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4368670 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C08L33/06, C08K5/12, C08K5/20, C08L71/02 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
C08G65/336 (EP);
C09D133/062 (US);
C08L33/06 (EP);
C08L71/02 (EP);
C09D133/10 (US);
C09D171/02 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] | Title | German: | HÄRTBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, GEHÄRTETES PRODUKT, BESCHICHTUNGSMITTEL UND BETONSTRUKTUR | [2024/20] | English: | CURABLE COMPOSITION, CURED PRODUCT, COATING AGENT, AND CONCRETE STRUCTURE | [2024/20] | French: | COMPOSITION DURCISSABLE, PRODUIT DURCI, AGENT DE REVÊTEMENT ET STRUCTURE EN BÉTON | [2024/20] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2024 | Translation filed | 02.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 02.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2001131424 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [A]JP2005097455 (TOAGOSEI CO LTD); | [A]WO2006112340 (KANEKA CORP [JP], et al); | [X]JP2009096899 (KANEKA CORP); | [X]JP2014088481 (KANEKA CORP) | by applicant | JPS5915336 | JPS61197631 | JPS61215622 | JPS61215623 | JPS61218632 | JPH0372527 | JPH10273512 | JP2002294022 | JP2007302749 | WO2008078654 | JP4627250B | JP2014111798 | JP2018162394 |