EP4369425 - SEMICONDUCTOR LIGHT EMITTING ELEMENT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SEMICONDUCTOR LIGHT EMITTING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOITO MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 8-3, Takanawa 4-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo, 108-8711 / JP | [2024/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANAOKA, Hiroaki Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP | 02 /
NOMURA, Akihiro Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 424-8764 / JP | [2024/20] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2024/20] | Application number, filing date | 22837593.7 | 30.06.2022 | [2024/20] | WO2022JP26276 | Priority number, date | JP20210113350 | 08.07.2021 Original published format: JP 2021113350 | JP20210113883 | 08.07.2021 Original published format: JP 2021113883 | [2024/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023282177 | Date: | 12.01.2023 | Language: | JA | [2023/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4369425 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/08, H01L33/06, H01L33/10, H01L33/22, H01L33/24, H01L33/32 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
H01L33/06 (EP);
H01L33/007 (EP);
H01L33/08 (EP);
H01L33/10 (EP);
H01L33/18 (EP);
H01L33/20 (EP);
H01L33/22 (EP);
H01L33/24 (EP);
H01L33/32 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] | Title | German: | LICHTEMITTIERENDES HALBLEITERELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES LICHTEMITTIERENDEN HALBLEITERELEMENTS | [2024/20] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR LIGHT EMITTING ELEMENT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SEMICONDUCTOR LIGHT EMITTING ELEMENT | [2024/20] | French: | ÉLÉMENT ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN ÉLÉMENT ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2024/20] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2024 | Translation filed | 03.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 03.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2010023921 (SOPHIA SCHOOL CORP [JP], et al); | [YAX]WO2011067872 (UNIV HOKKAIDO NAT UNIV CORP [JP], et al); | [A]US2016126412 (HWANG KYUNG WOOK [KR]); | [AY]JP2016521459 ; | [A]JP2018521516 ; | [A]CN110444562 (YUNGU GUAN TECH CO LTD); | [A]JP2020506535 ; | [PX]WO2022118634 (SONY GROUP CORP [JP]) | by applicant | JP2020077817 | JP2021113350 | JP2021113883 |