EP4355721 - HYDROFORMYLATION PROCESS FOR PREPARING LINEAR AND BRANCHED ALDEHYDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states North Carolina State University 1021 Main Campus Drive 2nd Floor Raleigh, North Carolina 27606 / US | [2024/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABOLHASANI, Milad Raleigh, North Carolina 27606 / US | 02 /
IBRAHIM, Malek, Y.S. Raleigh, North Carolina 27606 / US | [2024/17] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2024/17] | Application number, filing date | 22838414.5 | 07.07.2022 | [2024/17] | WO2022US36380 | Priority number, date | US202163219213P | 07.07.2021 Original published format: US 202163219213 P | US202163248290P | 24.09.2021 Original published format: US 202163248290 P | [2024/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023283351 | Date: | 12.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4355721 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07C45/50, B01J27/185, C07F9/02 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
C07C45/50 (EP);
B01J31/185 (EP);
B01J31/20 (EP);
B01J2231/321 (EP);
B01J2531/0288 (EP);
B01J2531/822 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/50, C07C47/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] | Title | German: | HYDROFORMYLIERUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON LINEAREN UND VERZWEIGTEN ALDEHYDEN | [2024/17] | English: | HYDROFORMYLATION PROCESS FOR PREPARING LINEAR AND BRANCHED ALDEHYDES | [2024/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'HYDROFORMYLATION POUR LA PRÉPARATION D'ALDÉHYDES LINÉAIRES ET RAMIFIÉS | [2024/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2009085160 (EASTMAN CHEM CO [US]) [Y] 1-22 * para [0006]; [0008]; [0009]; [0011]; [0030]; [0031]; [0034]; [0043]; [0048]; pg. 20; pg. 24, Table 1 *; | [Y]US7674937 (TOLLESON GINETTE STRUCK [US], et al) [Y] 1-22. * Col 5, In 49 to Col 6, In 2; Col 10, In 44-50; Col 11, In 21-23; Col 12, In 47-51; Col 12, In 62 to Col 13, In 3; Col 13, In 18-33 *; | [A]US9687837 (DEVON THOMAS JAMES [US]) [A] 1-22* ENTIRE DOCUMENT *; | [A] - RAGHUVANSHI et al., "Highly Efficient 1-Octene Hydroformylation at Low Syngas Pressure: From Single Droplet Screening to Continuous Flow Synthesis", ACS Catalysis, (20200000), vol. 10, doi:10.1021/acscatal.0c01515, pages 7535 - 7542, XP055859348 [A] 1-22 * . ENTIRE DOCUMENT * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acscatal.0c01515 |