EP4367147 - MUSCLE TARGETING COMPLEXES AND USES THEREOF FOR TREATING DYSTROPHINOPATHIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dyne Therapeutics, Inc. 1560 Trapelo Road Waltham MA 02451 / US | [2024/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESJARDINS, Cody, A. Waltham, MA 02451 / US | 02 /
TANG, Kim Waltham, MA 02451 / US | 03 /
MCSWIGGEN, James Arvada, CO 80007 / US | 04 /
SUBRAMANIAN, Romesh, R. Framingham, MA 01701 / US | 05 /
WEEDEN, Timothy Waltham, MA 02451 / US | 06 /
QATANANI, Mohammed, T. Waltham, MA 02451 / US | 07 /
QUINN, Brendan Boston, MA 02118 / US | 08 /
NAJIM, John Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2024/20] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/20] | Redhouse, Juliet Lauren, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 22838585.2 | 08.07.2022 | [2024/20] | WO2022US73527 | Priority number, date | US202163219999P | 09.07.2021 Original published format: US 202163219999 P | [2024/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023283613 | Date: | 12.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4367147 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/40, A61K47/68 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
C07K16/2881 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K47/6807 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K47/6849 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P21/04 (KR);
C12N15/113 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K2317/55 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N2310/11 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N2310/3233 (EP,IL,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] | Extension states | BA | 07.02.2024 | ME | 07.02.2024 | Validation states | KH | 07.02.2024 | MA | 07.02.2024 | MD | 07.02.2024 | TN | 07.02.2024 | Title | German: | AUF MUSKEL ABZIELENDE KOMPLEXE UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DYSTROPHINOPATHIEN | [2024/20] | English: | MUSCLE TARGETING COMPLEXES AND USES THEREOF FOR TREATING DYSTROPHINOPATHIES | [2024/20] | French: | COMPLEXES DE CIBLAGE MUSCULAIRE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE DYSTROPHINOPATHIES | [2024/20] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/20] | 15.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2008025913 (BOWDISH KATHERINE S [US], et al); | [A]US2008177045 (LEE E-CHIANG [US], et al); | [Y]WO2012087962 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2013026832 (ROCHE GLYCART AG [CH], et al); | [A]US2015266954 (DAVIES JULIAN [US], et al); | [Y]US2018142245 (WATANABE NAOKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2019119383 (BRUENKER PETER [CH], et al); | [Y]US2020282074 (LEVIN ARTHUR A [US], et al); |