EP4366720 - THE USE OF BETA-HYDROXYBUTYRATES FOR THE TREATMENT OR PREVENTION OF ANEURYSMS AND DISSECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Georgia State University Research Foundation, Inc. 30 Courtland Street Atlanta, GA 30303 / US | [2024/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZOU, Ming-Hui Peachtree Corners, Georgia 30097 / US | 02 /
HAN, Young-Min Buford, Georgia 30519 / US | [2024/20] | Representative(s) | Wright, Simon Mark Schlich Ltd 9 St. Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | [2024/20] | Application number, filing date | 22838614.0 | 09.07.2022 | [2024/20] | WO2022US73582 | Priority number, date | US202163220086P | 09.07.2021 Original published format: US 202163220086 P | [2024/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023283654 | Date: | 12.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4366720 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/19, A61P9/14 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
A61P9/14 (EP);
A61K31/19 (EP);
A61K31/22 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
C12Q1/6883 (EP);
C12Q2600/156 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON BETA-HYDROXYBUTYRATEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG ODER PRÄVENTION VON ANEURYSMEN UND DISSEKTIONEN | [2024/20] | English: | THE USE OF BETA-HYDROXYBUTYRATES FOR THE TREATMENT OR PREVENTION OF ANEURYSMS AND DISSECTIONS | [2024/20] | French: | UTILISATION DE BÊTA-HYDROXYBUTYRATES POUR LE TRAITEMENT OU LA PRÉVENTION D'ANÉVRISMES ET DE DISSECTIONS | [2024/20] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/20] | 16.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2007173787 (HUANG MARK C T [US], et al) [Y] 20-22 * entire document *; | [Y]US2007282247 (DESAI TEJAL [US], et al) [Y] 1-3, 15, 17-42 * entire document *; | [A]WO2010021766 (ISIS INNOVATION [GB], et al) [A] 1-3, 15, 17-42* entire document *; | [Y]US2010197563 (WIGHT THOMAS N [US], et al) [Y] 23, 34, 35 * entire document *; | [Y]US2011028331 (MILEWICZ DIANNA M [US], et al) [Y] 37-39 * entire document *; | [Y]US2012283269 (BLAGOSKLONNY MIKHAIL V [US], et al) [Y] 26 * entire document, *; | [Y]US2016209428 (NAVIAUX ROBERT K [US], et al) [Y] 40, 41 * entire document *; | [Y]US2016339019 (LABERGE REMI-MARTIN [US], et al) [Y] 24, 25, 28, 29 * entire document *; | [Y]US2020289444 (THOMAS WEIMBS [US], et al) [Y] 32, 33 * entire document *; | [Y]CN112176003 (ZHUHAI MEDPHA BIOTECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 1-3, 15, 17-42 * see machine translation * |