EP4372924 - TERMINAL HAVING MEMORY RING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | 19.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Changchun Jetty Automotive Technology Co., Ltd. No. 957, Shunda Road High-tech Development Zone Chaoyang District Changchun, Jilin 130000 / CN | [2024/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Chao Changchun, Jilin 130000 / CN | [2024/21] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2024/21] | Application number, filing date | 22841501.4 | 15.07.2022 | [2024/21] | WO2022CN106048 | Priority number, date | CN202110801855 | 15.07.2021 Original published format: CN202110801855 | CN202121611259U | 15.07.2021 Original published format: CN 202121611259 U | [2024/21] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023284868 | Date: | 19.01.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4372924 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/02, H01R13/629 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
H01R13/18 (EP);
H01R13/03 (US);
H01R13/111 (EP,US);
H01R13/6683 (EP,US);
H01R13/5205 (EP);
H01R4/01 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/21] | Title | German: | ENDGERÄT MIT SPEICHERRING | [2024/21] | English: | TERMINAL HAVING MEMORY RING | [2024/21] | French: | BORNE AYANT UN ANNEAU DE MÉMOIRE | [2024/21] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2024 | Translation filed | 08.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |