EP4226958 - SYSTEM FOR MIXING AND SPRAYING COOLANT AND COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Recensmedical, Inc. No.110-301-1, 50, UNIST-gil Eonyang-eup Ulju-gun, Ulsan 44919 / KR | [2023/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RO, Kyongkwan Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18466 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Boo Seong Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18466 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Chulho Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17117 / KR | [2023/33] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2023/33] | Application number, filing date | 22842389.3 | 11.07.2022 | [2023/33] | WO2022KR10017 | Priority number, date | KR20210091238 | 12.07.2021 Original published format: KR 20210091238 | KR20220081063 | 01.07.2022 Original published format: KR 20220081063 | [2023/33] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023287127 | Date: | 19.01.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4226958 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.01.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61M11/00, A61M19/00, A61M35/00, A61F7/00, B05B12/12, A45D34/04, A45D34/00, A61M11/06, B05B7/24 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
A61M11/06 (EP);
A61M11/02 (KR,US);
A61M35/00 (EP,KR,US);
A45D34/04 (EP,KR);
A61F7/00 (EP,US);
A61F7/0085 (KR);
B05B12/12 (EP,KR);
B05B7/2429 (EP);
A45D2034/005 (EP);
A45D2200/057 (KR);
A45D2200/155 (KR);
A61F2007/0052 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2007/0063 (KR,US);
A61F2007/0068 (EP);
A61F2007/0086 (KR);
A61F2007/0087 (EP,KR);
A61M2202/0225 (EP);
A61M2202/0266 (EP);
A61M2202/0275 (EP);
A61M2202/0283 (EP);
A61M2202/03 (EP);
A61M2205/3334 (EP);
A61M2205/3368 (EP);
A61M2205/3606 (EP);
A61M2205/502 (EP);
A61M2205/8225 (EP);
A61M2210/04 (EP);
A61M2230/50 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/33] | A61M11/00, A61M19/00, A61M35/00, A61F7/00, B05B12/12, A45D34/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM MISCHEN UND VERSPRÜHEN VON KÜHLMITTEL UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2023/33] | English: | SYSTEM FOR MIXING AND SPRAYING COOLANT AND COMPOSITION | [2023/33] | French: | SYSTÈME PERMETTANT DE MÉLANGER ET DE PULVÉRISER UN FLUIDE DE REFROIDISSEMENT ET UNE COMPOSITION | [2023/33] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2023 | Translation filed | 09.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 09.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/33] | 04.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH08215614 (NIPPON DENSO CO); | [A]KR20200002813U | International search | [A]JPH08215614 (NIPPON DENSO CO); | [A]CN105435982 (CHONGQING REAL ESTATE COLLEGE); | [A]KR20170142194 (BEAUTYGUN S L [ES]); | [A]WO2019016105 (DUTCH RENEWABLE ENERGY B V [NL]); | [A]KR20190090157 (AHN SOON HYUNG [KR]); | [A]KR20200002813U |