Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
19.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
29.03.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.02.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.01.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.12.2023 | Change - representative | |
22.12.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
20.01.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.01.2023 | New entry: applicant or inventor |