EP4245686 - AIRTIGHT CONTAINER FOR BATTERY CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | 19.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Jae-Sun Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Jun-Houng Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
KWON, Joo-Yeok Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
JANG, Eung-Jin Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Dae-Soo Gumi-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 39461 / KR | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 22842493.3 | 14.07.2022 | [2023/38] | WO2022KR10312 | Priority number, date | KR20210092490 | 14.07.2021 Original published format: KR 20210092490 | KR20220067393 | 02.06.2022 Original published format: KR 20220067393 | [2023/38] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023287231 | Date: | 19.01.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4245686 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.01.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/02, B65D81/113, H01M50/20, B65D25/10, B65D81/24, B65D81/26, H01M50/213 | [2024/30] | CPC: |
H01M10/613 (EP);
B65D25/10 (EP);
B65D43/0218 (EP);
H01M50/20 (EP);
H01M50/213 (EP);
B65D2543/00027 (EP);
B65D2543/00101 (EP);
B65D2543/00296 (EP);
B65D2543/00509 (EP);
B65D2543/00537 (EP);
B65D2543/00555 (EP);
B65D2543/00972 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/38] | B65D81/02, B65D81/113, H01M50/20, B65D25/10, B65D81/24, B65D81/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] | Title | German: | LUFTDICHTER BEHÄLTER FÜR BATTERIEZELLEN | [2023/38] | English: | AIRTIGHT CONTAINER FOR BATTERY CELLS | [2023/38] | French: | CONTENANT HERMÉTIQUE POUR ÉLÉMENTS DE BATTERIE | [2023/38] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2023 | Translation filed | 15.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 15.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US3747751 (MILLER J, et al); | [IA]US2005236346 (WHITNEY STEVEN G [US]); | [Y]KR20160116566 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [A]JP2017052545 (SUMITOMO DENKO SHOKETSU GOKIN KK); | [XY]CN211642988U (JIANGSU TAFEL NEW ENERGY TECH CO LTD, et al) | International search | [Y]US6419091 (GAFFNEY ROBERT C [US], et al); | [Y]US2011031159 (MINAMINO KOHJI [JP], et al); | [Y]KR20160116566 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [Y]JP2017052545 (SUMITOMO DENKO SHOKETSU GOKIN KK); | [Y]KR20190101165 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]); | [XY]CN211642988U (JIANGSU TAFEL NEW ENERGY TECH CO LTD, et al) | by applicant | KR20140094898 | KR20210092490 | KR20220067393 |