Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
27.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
02.04.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.03.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.02.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.02.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
16.02.2024 | Change - representative | |
16.02.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.01.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.01.2023 | New entry: applicant or inventor |