Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN117729899 | Global Dossier | 19.03.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022KR10545 | 19.07.2022 | KR20210094205 | 19.07.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4374816 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022KR10545 | 19.07.2022 | KR20210094205 | 19.07.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2023003328 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20210094205 | 19.07.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102612159B | Global Dossier | 12.12.2023 | B1 | KR20230013713 | 27.01.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20210094205 | 19.07.2021 |