EP4377667 - PRE-MIX TEST VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atomo Diagnostics Limited Level 1, 3-5 George Street Leichhardt, NSW 2040 / AU | [2024/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KETKAR, Rohit Leichhardt, New South Wales 2040 / AU | 02 /
KEANE, Alan Leichhardt, New South Wales 2040 / AU | 03 /
SUKUMAR, Chandra Leichhardt, New South Wales 2040 / AU | 04 /
KELLY, John Leichhardt, New South Wales 2040 / AU | 05 /
SMITH, Mark Leichhardt, New South Wales 2040 / AU | 06 /
WHEELER, Toby Leichhardt, New South Wales 2040 / AU | 07 /
WALLIS, Huw Leichhardt, New South Wales 2040 / AU | 08 /
HUNG, Andrew Leichhardt, New South Wales 2040 / AU | 09 /
HARRIS, Jake Leichhardt, New South Wales 2040 / AU | [2024/23] | Representative(s) | Budde Schou A/S Dronningens Tvaergade 30 1302 Copenhagen K / DK | [2024/23] | Application number, filing date | 22847731.1 | 29.07.2022 | [2024/23] | WO2022AU50812 | Priority number, date | AU20210902352 | 30.07.2021 Original published format: AU 2021902352 | AU20220900285 | 11.02.2022 Original published format: AU 2022900285 | [2024/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023004474 | Date: | 02.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4377667 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 02.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/38, G01N35/00, G01N35/10, G01N33/487, A61B10/00, A61B5/15 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
A61B10/0051 (EP,AU,KR);
G01N1/38 (AU,KR);
A61B10/0038 (AU,KR);
A61B10/007 (AU,KR);
A61B5/15 (AU,KR);
A61B5/150022 (EP,KR);
A61B5/150343 (EP,KR);
A61B5/150358 (EP,KR);
A61B5/150755 (EP,KR);
A61B5/150847 (EP,KR);
A61B5/157 (EP,KR);
B01L3/5029 (EP,KR);
B01L3/52 (EP,KR);
G01N33/4875 (AU,KR);
G01N33/48778 (AU,KR);
G01N35/10 (AU,KR);
A61B2010/0003 (AU,KR);
A61B2010/0006 (EP,KR);
B01L2200/027 (EP,KR);
B01L2200/10 (EP,KR);
B01L2200/16 (EP,KR);
B01L2300/0825 (EP,KR);
G01N2035/00108 (AU,KR);
G01N2035/00148 (AU,KR);
G01N2035/1058 (AU,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORMISCHUNGS-TESTBEHÄLTER | [2024/23] | English: | PRE-MIX TEST VESSEL | [2024/23] | French: | RÉCIPIENT DE TEST DE PRÉMÉLANGE | [2024/23] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2023 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 26.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/23] | 24.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2005045408 (AMERICAN BIO MEDICA CORP [US], et al); | [X]US2006292035 (GOULD MARTIN [US], et al); | [X]WO2013181616 (HEALTH & BLISS LLC [US], et al); | [X]WO2014072753 (MODE DIAGNOSTICS LTD [GB]); | [X]US2015219536 (HODER MATTHIAS [DE], et al); | [X]US2015260708 (CASTERLIN DOUGLAS [US], et al); | [X]US2016025752 (SANTIAGO FRANK [US], et al); | [X]US2017096697 (DONNELLY DORAN [US], et al); | [X]US2017176302 (BEARINGER JANE P [US], et al); | [X]WO2018167673 (MAGAGULA LORETTA QINISILE [ZA]); | [X]US2018311664 (LANSING BLISS H [US], et al); | [PX]WO2021222866 (LUMINOSTICS INC [US]) |