EP4382520 - PYRIMIDINE-4,6-DIAMINE DERIVATIVE, A PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, AND A PHARMACEUTICAL APPLICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | 03.10.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abbisko Therapeutics Co., Ltd. No. 3, Lane 898, HaLei Road China (Shanghai) Pilot Free Trade Zone Pudong New Area Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2024/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Fei Shanghai 201203 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Shuqun Shanghai 201203 / CN | 03 /
YU, Hongping Shanghai 201203 / CN | 04 /
CHEN, Zhui Shanghai 201203 / CN | 05 /
XU, Yaochang Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2024/24] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [2024/24] | Application number, filing date | 22852013.6 | 28.07.2022 | [2024/24] | WO2022CN108432 | Priority number, date | CN202110879406 | 02.08.2021 Original published format: CN202110879406 | CN202210416287 | 20.04.2022 Original published format: CN202210416287 | [2024/24] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023011299 | Date: | 09.02.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4382520 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, C07D401/14, C07D403/12, C07D403/14, A61K31/505, A61K31/506, A61P35/00 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
C07D401/14 (EP,KR);
A61K31/505 (EP);
A61K31/506 (EP,KR);
A61K31/5377 (KR);
A61P35/04 (KR);
C07D401/12 (EP);
C07D403/12 (EP);
C07D403/14 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/24] | Title | German: | PYRIMIDIN-4,6-DIAMIN-DERIVAT, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE ANWENDUNG DAVON | [2024/24] | English: | PYRIMIDINE-4,6-DIAMINE DERIVATIVE, A PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, AND A PHARMACEUTICAL APPLICATION THEREOF | [2024/24] | French: | DÉRIVÉ DE PYRIMIDINE-4,6-DIAMINE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET SON UTILISATION PHARMACEUTIQUE | [2024/24] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2023 | Translation filed | 12.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |