EP4383921 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PERFORMING RANDOM ACCESS PROCEDURE IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2024/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Youngdae Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Jaehyung Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
YANG, Suckchel Seoul 06772 / KR | 04 /
HWANG, Seunggye Seoul 06772 / KR | [2024/24] | Representative(s) | Mooser, Sebastian Thomas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [2024/24] | Application number, filing date | 22853521.7 | 05.08.2022 | [2024/24] | WO2022KR11620 | Priority number, date | KR20210103449 | 05.08.2021 Original published format: KR 20210103449 | [2024/24] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023014146 | Date: | 09.02.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4383921 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08, H04W74/00, H04W8/24 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
H04W74/0833 (EP);
H04W72/0453 (EP);
H04W72/51 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINES DIREKTZUGRIFFSVERFAHRENS IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2024/24] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PERFORMING RANDOM ACCESS PROCEDURE IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2024/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR EFFECTUER UNE PROCÉDURE D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2024/24] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2024 | Translation filed | 23.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 23.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]KR20200051726 (CONVIDA WIRELESS LLC [US]); | [A]KR20200136021 (BEIJING XIAOMI MOBILE SOFTWARE CO LTD [CN]); | [A]US2020413454 (YE QIAOYANG [US], et al); |