EP4383817 - METHOD FOR OPERATING REMOTE UE RELATED TO PATH SWITCHING AND MEASUREMENT REPORTING IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2024/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACK, Seoyoung Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Giwon Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Seungmin Seoul 06772 / KR | 04 /
HONG, Jongwoo Seoul 06772 / KR | [2024/24] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2024/24] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 22853532.4 | 05.08.2022 | [2024/24] | WO2022KR11642 | Priority number, date | US202163229999P | 05.08.2021 Original published format: US 202163229999 P | US202163234230P | 17.08.2021 Original published format: US 202163234230 P | KR20210164840 | 25.11.2021 Original published format: KR 20210164840 | [2024/24] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023014157 | Date: | 09.02.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4383817 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00, H04W76/23, H04W76/14, H04W24/10 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
H04W76/23 (EP);
H04W36/03 (EP,KR);
H04B17/328 (KR);
H04W24/08 (EP,KR);
H04W24/10 (EP,KR);
H04W36/00 (EP);
H04W36/0058 (EP,KR);
H04W36/0079 (EP,KR);
H04W40/22 (EP);
H04W40/34 (EP,KR);
H04W76/14 (EP,KR);
H04W76/19 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES ENTFERNTEN BENUTZERGERÄTS IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT PFADUMSCHALTUNG UND MESSBERICHTERSTATTUNG IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2024/24] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING REMOTE UE RELATED TO PATH SWITCHING AND MEASUREMENT REPORTING IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2024/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR À DISTANCE ASSOCIÉ À UNE COMMUTATION DE TRAJET ET À UN RAPPORT DE MESURE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2024/24] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2024 | Translation filed | 07.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR20180043379 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); |