EP4380628 - METHODS FOR BIOLOGICAL MATERIAL LABELING AND MEDICAL IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mayo Foundation for Medical Education and Research 200 First Street S.W. Rochester, Minnesota 55905 / US | [2024/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANSAL, Aditya Rochester, Minnesota 55906- 3457 / US | 02 /
DEGRADO, Timothy R. Arvada, Colorado 80004-1827 / US | 03 /
PANDEY, Mukesh K. Rochester, Minnesota 55901 / US | [2024/24] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [2024/24] | Application number, filing date | 22853956.5 | 05.08.2022 | [2024/24] | WO2022US39582 | Priority number, date | US202163230318P | 06.08.2021 Original published format: US 202163230318 P | [2024/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023014975 | Date: | 09.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4380628 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K51/02, A61K51/04, A61K49/06, A61K51/00 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
A61K51/10 (EP);
A61K51/0497 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MARKIERUNG VON BIOLOGISCHEM MATERIAL UND MEDIZINISCHE BILDGEBUNG | [2024/24] | English: | METHODS FOR BIOLOGICAL MATERIAL LABELING AND MEDICAL IMAGING | [2024/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE MARQUAGE DE SUBSTANCE BIOLOGIQUE ET D'IMAGERIE MÉDICALE | [2024/24] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 09.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |