EP4193598 - GEOMETRIC PARTITION MODE WITH INTRA BLOCK COPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent America LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Lien-Fei Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 02 /
LI, Xiang Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 03 /
LI, Ling Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 04 /
LIU, Shan Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/24] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22854046.4 | 01.08.2022 | [2023/24] | WO2022US74378 | Priority number, date | US202163228329P | 02.08.2021 Original published format: US 202163228329 P | US202217877812 | 29.07.2022 Original published format: US202217877812 | [2023/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023015160 | Date: | 09.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4193598 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.02.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/107, H04N19/11, H04N19/119, H04N19/159, H04N19/176, H04N19/52, H04N19/543, H04N19/70 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
H04N19/70 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/119 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/105 (US);
H04N19/107 (EP,US);
H04N19/109 (KR);
H04N19/11 (EP,KR);
H04N19/132 (US);
H04N19/139 (US);
H04N19/159 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/172 (US);
H04N19/176 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/423 (US);
H04N19/513 (US);
H04N19/52 (EP);
H04N19/543 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/24] | H04N19/44, H04N19/103, H04N19/105, H04N19/159 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEOMETRISCHER PARTITIONSMODUS MIT INTRABLOCKKOPIE | [2023/24] | English: | GEOMETRIC PARTITION MODE WITH INTRA BLOCK COPY | [2023/24] | French: | MODE DE PARTITION GÉOMÉTRIQUE AVEC COPIE INTRA-BLOC | [2023/24] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 06.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 24.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IAY]WO2020088691 (BEIJING BYTEDANCE NETWORK TECH CO LTD [CN], et al); | International search | [A]US2013108182 (YIE CHUNG KU [KR], et al); | [A]US2018070088 (ZHENG YUNFEI [US], et al); | [A]US2021160520 (CHEN LIEN-FEI [TW], et al) | by applicant | WO2020088691 |