Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023085225 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202163229269 | 04.08.2021 | US202217817545 | 04.08.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024531918 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | US202163229269 | 04.08.2021 | WO2022US74540 | 04.08.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3227939 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202163229269 | 04.08.2021 | WO2022US74540 | 04.08.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2022323523 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202163229269 | 04.08.2021 | WO2022US74540 | 04.08.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4381436 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202163229269 | 04.08.2021 | WO2022US74540 | 04.08.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2023015256 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202163229269 | 04.08.2021 |