EP4369183 - CLOUD PLATFORM MANAGEMENT ARCHITECTURE, METHOD AND DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2024/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUAN, Rui Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Hao Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Xuesheng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
XU, Daigang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2024/20] | Representative(s) | Savi, Massimiliano, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [2024/20] | Application number, filing date | 22854983.8 | 07.05.2022 | [2024/20] | WO2022CN91530 | Priority number, date | CN202110915014 | 10.08.2021 Original published format: CN202110915014 | [2024/20] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023015988 | Date: | 16.02.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4369183 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.02.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F8/71, G06F9/50 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
G06F9/5072 (EP);
G06F11/36 (EP);
G06F8/71 (EP);
G06F8/76 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARCHITEKTUR, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWALTUNG EINER CLOUD-PLATTFORM UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2024/20] | English: | CLOUD PLATFORM MANAGEMENT ARCHITECTURE, METHOD AND DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2024/20] | French: | ARCHITECTURE, PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE GESTION DE PLATEFORME EN NUAGE, ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2024/20] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2024 | Translation filed | 08.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2018276060 (ARUMUGAM RATHINASABAPATHY [IN]); | International search | [A]CN109347663 (NANJING YIJIE SIDA SOFTWARE TECH CO LTD); | [A]US2019281112 (BHAT ASHISH [US], et al); | [A]CN110704164 (ZHUHAI XINDEHUI INFORMATION TECH CO LTD); | [A]US2020218580 (KIM IN SEOK [KR]); | [A]CN112799789 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD) |