EP4386258 - LAMP MOUNTING STRUCTURE AND LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suzhou Opple Lighting Co., Ltd. R&D Building A of OPPLE Lighting Fenyang Road Fen Lake Developing Zone Wujiang District Suzhou, Jiangsu 215211 / CN | For all designated states Opple Lighting Co., Ltd. Room 411 Building 1 No. 6111 Longdong Avenue Pudong New District Shanghai 201201 / CN | [2024/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIE, Jianmin Suzhou, Jiangsu 215211 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Qingquan Suzhou, Jiangsu 215211 / CN | 03 /
TAN, Xingchen Suzhou, Jiangsu 215211 / CN | [2024/25] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2024/25] | Application number, filing date | 22855456.4 | 10.08.2022 | [2024/25] | WO2022CN111311 | Priority number, date | CN202121867723U | 11.08.2021 Original published format: CN 202121867723 U | CN202110917473 | 11.08.2021 Original published format: CN202110917473 | [2024/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023016475 | Date: | 16.02.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4386258 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.02.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F21V21/26, F21V21/02, F21V21/30, F21V21/36, // F21S8/04, F21V21/03 | [2024/42] | CPC: |
F21V21/30 (EP,US);
F21V21/02 (EP);
F21V21/26 (EP);
F21V21/36 (EP);
F21S8/043 (EP);
F21V21/03 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2024/25] | F21V21/14, F21V21/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LAMPENMONTAGESTRUKTUR UND LAMPE | [2024/25] | English: | LAMP MOUNTING STRUCTURE AND LAMP | [2024/25] | French: | STRUCTURE DE MONTAGE DE LAMPE ET LAMPE | [2024/25] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2024 | Translation filed | 11.03.2024 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2024 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |