Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
14.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
13.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
13.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
15.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
17.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
22.04.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.03.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.03.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.03.2024 | Change - representative | |
11.03.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.02.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.02.2023 | New entry: applicant or inventor |