Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024240779 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202121867723 | 11.08.2021 | CN202110917473 | 11.08.2021 | WO2022CN111311 | 10.08.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113587056 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202110917473 | 11.08.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4386258 | Global Dossier | 19.06.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202121867723 | 11.08.2021 | CN202110917473 | 11.08.2021 | WO2022CN111311 | 10.08.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN215929499U | 01.03.2022 | U | Priority number | Date | CN202121867723 | 11.08.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2023016475 | Global Dossier | 16.02.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202121867723 | 11.08.2021 | CN202110917473 | 11.08.2021 |