EP4365721 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE INCLUDING FLEXIBLE DISPLAY AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | 05.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Minho Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
CHOI, Juyong Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Jinhyun Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
JANG, Jongwoon Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/19] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2024/19] | Application number, filing date | 22855989.4 | 10.06.2022 | [2024/19] | WO2022KR08240 | Priority number, date | KR20210105678 | 10.08.2021 Original published format: KR 20210105678 | [2024/19] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023017987 | Date: | 16.02.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4365721 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0481, G06F3/0486, G06F3/0488, G06F3/14, G06F3/16, G06F9/451, H04N23/60 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
G06F9/451 (EP,KR);
G06F3/0481 (EP,KR);
G06F3/0482 (EP,US);
G06F1/1652 (US);
G06F16/24 (US);
G06F16/73 (KR);
G06F3/0486 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/0488 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/14 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/16 (KR,US);
G06F3/165 (EP);
H04N23/62 (EP,KR);
H04N23/631 (EP,KR);
H04N23/632 (EP,KR);
H04N23/80 (EP,KR);
G06F2203/04803 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT FLEXIBLER ANZEIGE UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB DAVON | [2024/19] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE INCLUDING FLEXIBLE DISPLAY AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAME | [2024/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE INCLUANT UNE UNITÉ D'AFFICHAGE FLEXIBLE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2024/19] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2024 | Translation filed | 30.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 30.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]KR20100010151 (KT TECH INC [KR]); | [Y]KR20150072689 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]KR20160150539 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [XY]KR20180073959 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]KR20200005211 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) |