EP4286456 - POLYMER COMPOSITE AND MOLDED PRODUCT COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128 Yeoudo-dong Yeoui-daero, Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2023/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Minsung Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Chee Sung Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
HWANG, Daehyeon Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
JEON, Kwang Seoung Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2023/49] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2023/49] | Application number, filing date | 22856031.4 | 13.07.2022 | [2023/49] | WO2022KR10239 | Priority number, date | KR20210107616 | 13.08.2021 Original published format: KR 20210107616 | KR20220077702 | 24.06.2022 Original published format: KR 20220077702 | [2023/49] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023018030 | Date: | 16.02.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4286456 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.02.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/04, C08J5/06, C08L101/00, C08L21/00, C08L23/08, C08L23/16, C08L9/02, C08L9/06, C08L1/02, C08K3/013 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
C08L1/02 (EP,US);
C08K7/02 (US);
C08J5/045 (EP,US);
C08K3/22 (EP,US);
C08L23/12 (EP,US);
C08L51/06 (US);
C08J2323/12 (EP,US);
C08J2401/02 (US);
C08K2003/2237 (US);
C08K2003/2241 (EP);
C08K2003/2296 (EP);
C08K2201/003 (US);
C08K2201/004 (US);
C08K2201/005 (EP);
C08K2201/011 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/12, C08L51/06, C08L1/02, C08L1/02, C08K3/22, C08K3/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYMERVERBUNDSTOFF UND FORMPRODUKT DAMIT | [2023/49] | English: | POLYMER COMPOSITE AND MOLDED PRODUCT COMPRISING SAME | [2023/49] | French: | COMPOSITE POLYMÈRE ET PRODUIT MOULÉ LE COMPRENANT | [2023/49] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2023 | Translation filed | 29.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]CN105670111 (UNIV NANJING FORESTRY); | [Y]CN107805346 (SICHUAN KELIXIN NEW MAT CO LTD); | International search | [A]KR101823660B ; | [A]JP2020033541 (PANASONIC CORP); | [Y]JP2020070379 (DAIO SEISHI KK); | [A]JP2020193262 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD); | by applicant | KR20210107616 | KR20220077702 |