EP4384147 - INGESTIBLE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Massachusetts Institute of Technology 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | For all designated states The Brigham and Women's Hospital, Inc. 75 Francis Street Boston, MA 02115 / US | For all designated states Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 1 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [2024/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRAVERSO, Carlo Giovanni Newton, MA 02459 / US | 02 /
GWYNNE, Declan New York, NY 10032 / US | 03 /
WAINER, Jacob Malden, MA 02148 / US | 04 /
ARRICK, Graham San Francisco, CA 94110 / US | 05 /
WINDUM, Jesper 3400 Hillerod / DK | 06 /
SANGER, Kuldeep Kurukshetra, 136135 / IN | 07 /
BOHR, Adam 2450 Copenhagen / DK | 08 /
MOURIDSEN, Brian 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | 09 /
JAKOBSEN, Nikolaj Eusebius 2860 Søborg / DK | 10 /
FREDERIKSEN, Morten Revsgaard 1424 Copenhagen / DK | 11 /
LAURSEN, Jens Lolle 4040 Jyllinge / DK | 12 /
AGUILAR, Ludwig Erik 3400 Hillerød / DK | [2024/25] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2024/25] | Application number, filing date | 22856433.2 | 04.08.2022 | [2024/25] | WO2022US39374 | Priority number, date | US202163231206P | 09.08.2021 Original published format: US 202163231206 P | [2024/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023018591 | Date: | 16.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4384147 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/48, A61K9/00, A61M31/00 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
A61K9/4808 (EP);
A61M31/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINNEHMBARE VORRICHTUNG | [2024/25] | English: | INGESTIBLE DEVICE | [2024/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF INGÉRABLE | [2024/25] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 06.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2010021536 (GROSS YOSSI [IL]); | [Y]US2012010590 (IMRAN MIR [US]); | [Y]US2018250226 (BETSER NIR [IL], et al); | [Y]US2020129441 (ABRAMSON ALEX G [US], et al) |