EP4391107 - LITHIUM ION SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | 24.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vehicle Energy Japan Inc. 1410, Inada Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8505 / JP | [2024/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INABA, Akira Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8505 / JP | 02 /
TACHIKAWA, Yusuke Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8505 / JP | 03 /
TOOYAMA, Tatsuya Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8505 / JP | 04 /
KUROKI, Yasutaka Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8505 / JP | 05 /
MIKI, Takeshi Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8505 / JP | [2024/26] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2024/26] | Application number, filing date | 22857088.3 | 29.03.2022 | [2024/26] | WO2022JP15299 | Priority number, date | JP20210133832 | 19.08.2021 Original published format: JP 2021133832 | [2024/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023021781 | Date: | 23.02.2023 | Language: | JA | [2023/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4391107 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/133, H01M4/36, H01M4/587, H01M4/62 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
H01M4/36 (EP);
H01M4/583 (US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M4/133 (EP);
H01M4/364 (US);
H01M4/366 (EP,US);
H01M4/483 (US);
H01M4/587 (EP);
H01M4/62 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LITHIUMIONEN-SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2024/26] | English: | LITHIUM ION SECONDARY BATTERY | [2024/26] | French: | BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM-ION | [2024/26] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2023 | Translation filed | 04.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 04.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 04.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH06325753 (SHARP KK); | [YX]JPH08124559 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JP2010272503 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [YAX]JP2011233541 (NIPPON CARBON CO LTD); | [YAX]WO2013002162 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2018163833 | JP2020123494 | JP2021133832 |