Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4388009 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

AU2022331786 CA3225986 CN2022113739W CN202280069781 EP22857930 IL31093824 JP2024510434 KR20247007534 US202218685068



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2023020621Global Dossier 23.02.2023A1
Priority number Date
WO2021CN113913 20.08.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2025019451Global Dossier 16.01.2025A1
Priority number Date
WO2022CN113739 19.08.2022
WO2021CN113913 20.08.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20240046533Global Dossier 09.04.2024A
Priority number Date
WO2022CN113739 19.08.2022
WO2021CN113913 20.08.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2024531409Global Dossier 29.08.2024A
Priority number Date
WO2022CN113739 19.08.2022
WO2021CN113913 20.08.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL310938Global Dossier 01.04.2024A
Priority number Date
WO2022CN113739 19.08.2022
WO2021CN113913 20.08.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN118176210Global Dossier 11.06.2024A
Priority number Date
WO2022CN113739 19.08.2022
WO2021CN113913 20.08.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA3225986Global Dossier 23.02.2023A1
Priority number Date
WO2022CN113739 19.08.2022
WO2021CN113913 20.08.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2022331786Global Dossier 04.04.2024A1
Priority number Date
WO2022CN113739 19.08.2022
WO2021CN113913 20.08.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4388009Global Dossier 26.06.2024A1
Priority number Date
WO2022CN113739 19.08.2022
WO2021CN113913 20.08.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2024002238 29.04.2024A
Priority number Date
WO2022CN113739 19.08.2022
WO2021CN113913 20.08.2021