EP4376569 - STACKED PHOTOVOLTAIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Longi Green Energy Technology Co., Ltd. No. 388 Middle Aerospace Road, Chang'an District Xi'an, Shaanxi 710100 / CN | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Zhao Xi' an, Shaanxi 710100 / CN | 02 /
XU, Chen Xi' an, Shaanxi 710100 / CN | 03 /
LI, Zifeng Xi' an, Shaanxi 710100 / CN | 04 /
XIE, Junjie Xi' an, Shaanxi 710100 / CN | 05 /
LIU, Tong Xi' an, Shaanxi 710100 / CN | [2024/22] | Representative(s) | Loo, Chi Ching, et al Albright IP Limited County House Bayshill Road Cheltenham, Gloucestershire GL50 3BA / GB | [2024/22] | Application number, filing date | 22859968.4 | 26.05.2022 | [2024/22] | WO2022CN95201 | Priority number, date | CN20211100183 | 27.08.2021 Original published format: CN202111000183 | [2024/22] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023024620 | Date: | 02.03.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4376569 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H10K30/80, H01L31/0216 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
H10K39/15 (EP);
H01L31/0216 (EP);
H01L31/068 (EP);
H10K30/40 (EP);
H10K30/50 (EP);
Y02E10/549 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESTAPELTE FOTOVOLTAISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2024/22] | English: | STACKED PHOTOVOLTAIC DEVICE | [2024/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF PHOTOVOLTAÏQUE EMPILÉ | [2024/22] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2024 | Translation filed | 22.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 22.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2011014635 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO); | [A]US2017271622 (CHAUDHARI ASHOK [US]); | [A]CN110521008 (OXFORD PHOTOVOLTAICS LTD); | [A]CN113257940 (LONGJI GREEN ENERGY TECH CO LTD) |