EP4393137 - TRANSFER SYSTEM FOR TRANSFERRING STREAMING DATA, AND METHOD FOR TRANSFERRING STREAMING DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lempea Oy Kaivokatu 10 B 00100 Helsinki / FI | [2024/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAGERSPETZ, Eemil 00100 Helsinki / FI | [2024/27] | Representative(s) | Primrose Oy Unioninkatu 24 00130 Helsinki / FI | [2024/27] | Application number, filing date | 22860690.1 | 24.08.2022 | [2024/27] | WO2022FI50544 | Priority number, date | FI20210005895 | 25.08.2021 Original published format: FI 20215895 | [2024/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023025988 | Date: | 02.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4393137 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 02.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L65/61, H04L65/1045, H04L65/75, H04L45/00, H04W24/02, G06V20/56 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
H04L67/5651 (EP,FI);
H04L65/1045 (EP);
H04L65/60 (FI);
H04L65/612 (EP);
H04L65/80 (EP);
H04L67/56 (FI);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON STREAMING-DATEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON STREAMING-DATEN | [2024/27] | English: | TRANSFER SYSTEM FOR TRANSFERRING STREAMING DATA, AND METHOD FOR TRANSFERRING STREAMING DATA | [2024/27] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRANSFERT POUR TRANSFÉRER DES DONNÉES DE DIFFUSION EN CONTINU, ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSFERT DE DONNÉES DE DIFFUSION EN CONTINU | [2024/27] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2024 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2024 | Search fee paid | 22.03.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2017048328 (KOROTAEV KIRILL [RU], et al); | [A]US2018159745 (BYERS CHARLES CALVIN [US], et al); | [A]US2018332324 (MUTTON JAMES A [US]); | [Y]US10944804 (GHARE GAURAV D [US], et al); |