EP4393057 - RAIL-BASED SOLAR PANEL MOUNTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IronRidge, Inc. 28357 Industrial Blvd Hayward, CA 94545 / US | [2024/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEDLAR, Roger Phoenix, AZ 85022 / US | 02 /
LESTER, Bryan Phoenix, AZ 85013 / US | 03 /
JUSTICE, Anumeha Leesburg, VA 20175 / US | 04 /
MENTON, Duane Vallejo, CA 94591 / US | 05 /
GREER, Joe Phoenix, AZ 85028 / US | 06 /
PARSLEY, Alexander Folsom, CA 94565 / US | 07 /
WENSLEY, Jordan San Diego, CA 92117 / US | [2024/27] | Representative(s) | Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [2024/27] | Application number, filing date | 22862013.4 | 24.08.2022 | [2024/27] | WO2022US41312 | Priority number, date | US202163236385P | 24.08.2021 Original published format: US 202163236385 P | [2024/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023028101 | Date: | 02.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4393057 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02S20/00, H02S20/10, H02S20/20, H02S20/22, H02S20/23, F24S25/634, F24S25/30, F24S25/33, F24S25/40, F24S25/50, F24S25/60, F24S25/61 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
H02S20/23 (EP,US);
F24S25/30 (EP,US);
F24S25/33 (EP);
F24S25/40 (EP);
F24S25/636 (EP);
F24S25/65 (US);
F24S2025/6003 (EP,US);
F24S2025/6006 (US);
F24S2025/801 (EP);
F24S2025/804 (EP);
F24S25/35 (US);
F24S25/634 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHIENENBASIERTES SOLARPANEELMONTAGESYSTEM | [2024/27] | English: | RAIL-BASED SOLAR PANEL MOUNTING SYSTEM | [2024/27] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MONTAGE DE PANNEAU SOLAIRE À BASE DE RAIL | [2024/27] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2024 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2024 | Search fee paid | 15.03.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/27] | 02.10.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2011001030 (HOCHREITER ERWIN [AT], et al); | [A]US9076899 (SCHROCK CLIFFORD BARRY [US]); | [A]US9777948 (BRAUNSTEIN RYAN [US], et al); | [A]US9893677 (LIU JUN [US]); | [A]WO2022132135 (PEGASUS SOLAR INC [US]); |