EP4209262 - BUBBLE COLUMN REACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG CHEM, LTD. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2023/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HWANG, Moon Sub Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Jeong Seok Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Hong Min Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2023/28] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/28] | Application number, filing date | 22862404.5 | 05.07.2022 | [2023/28] | WO2022KR09669 | Priority number, date | KR20210162827 | 23.11.2021 Original published format: KR 20210162827 | [2023/28] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023096049 | Date: | 01.06.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4209262 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.06.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B01F23/231, B01J8/18, B01J8/22 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
C07C2/32 (EP);
B01F23/231 (KR);
B01J10/002 (EP,US);
B01F23/23121 (KR);
B01F35/712 (KR);
B01F35/7179 (KR);
B01F35/75 (KR);
B01J12/00 (KR);
B01J19/006 (EP);
B01J19/26 (US);
B01J4/002 (EP,US);
B01J4/004 (EP);
B01J4/005 (EP);
B01J8/1827 (EP);
B01J8/22 (EP);
C07C11/04 (KR);
C07C11/107 (KR);
C07C2/08 (KR);
B01J2219/00076 (EP);
B01J2219/00083 (EP);
B01J2219/00761 (US);
| C-Set: |
C07C2/32, C07C11/107 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/28] | B01F23/231 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BLASENSÄULENREAKTOR | [2023/28] | English: | BUBBLE COLUMN REACTOR | [2023/28] | French: | RÉACTEUR À COLONNE À BULLES | [2023/28] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2023 | Translation filed | 10.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 10.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/28] | 15.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]EP0810902 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [IY]EP1735086 (STATOIL ASA [NO], et al); | [IY]EP1786555 (EASTMAN CHEM CO [US]); | [Y]EP2190555 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | [Y]US8221674 (HAUZENBERGER FRANZ [AT], et al); | [Y]US2018030181 (EMOTO HIROKI [US]); | [Y]EP3871767 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) | International search | [XY]KR19980702341 ; | [A]CN103657558 (CHINA NERIN ENG CO LTD); | [A]JP2017522180 ; | [Y]KR20180062972 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]); | [Y]KR20210072405 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) |