EP4395928 - METHOD AND CATALYST FOR METHANE CONVERSION TO CYCLOHEXANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Royal Institution for the Advancement of Learning / McGill University Office of Sponsored Research 845 Sherbrooke Street West Unit 211 Montreal, Quebec H3A 0G4 / CA | [2024/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Chao-jun Québec J4Y 3J6 / CA | 02 /
TAN, Lida Montreal, Québec H3B 3A7 / CA | [2024/28] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [2024/28] | Application number, filing date | 22862473.0 | 31.08.2022 | [2024/28] | WO2022CA51315 | Priority number, date | US202163240048P | 02.09.2021 Original published format: US 202163240048 P | [2024/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023028705 | Date: | 09.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4395928 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 09.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/08, B01J27/24, B01J37/02, B01J37/16, C07C2/76 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
B01J27/24 (EP);
B01J23/42 (EP);
B01J23/62 (EP);
B01J35/23 (EP);
B01J35/30 (EP);
B01J37/16 (EP);
B01J37/344 (EP);
C07C2/76 (EP);
C07C2523/08 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C07C2/76, C07C13/18 (EP);
C07C2/76, C07C15/04 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND KATALYSATOR ZUR UMWANDLUNG VON METHAN IN CYCLOHEXAN | [2024/28] | English: | METHOD AND CATALYST FOR METHANE CONVERSION TO CYCLOHEXANE | [2024/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET CATALYSEUR POUR LA CONVERSION DU MÉTHANE EN CYCLOHEXANE | [2024/28] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2024 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2024 | Search fee paid | 05.03.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO2009062096 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US], et al); | [XA]CN101670286 (UNIV BEIJING); | [A]WO2015035518 (UNIV MCGILL [CA]); | [XA]CN105618039 (HUNAN INST SCIENCE & TECH); |