EP4398650 - INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Datang Mobile Communications Equipment Co., Ltd. 1/F, Building 1, No. 5 Shangdi East Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2024/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Li Beijing 100085 / CN | [2024/28] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2024/28] | Application number, filing date | 22863383.0 | 29.08.2022 | [2024/28] | WO2022CN115488 | Priority number, date | CN20211125578 | 02.09.2021 Original published format: CN202111025578 | [2024/28] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023030247 | Date: | 09.03.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4398650 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02, H04W76/28 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
H04W4/06 (EP);
H04W52/02 (EP);
H04W52/0216 (EP);
H04W52/0219 (EP);
H04W52/0229 (EP);
H04W52/0235 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG SOWIE LESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2024/28] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2024/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE | [2024/28] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2024 | Translation filed | 27.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |