EP4387359 - DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD AND COMMUNICATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Jun Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
JIAO, Shurong Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
HUA, Meng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/25] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2024/25] | Application number, filing date | 22863531.4 | 31.08.2022 | [2024/25] | WO2022CN116267 | Priority number, date | CN20211133122 | 03.09.2021 Original published format: CN202111033122 | [2024/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023030396 | Date: | 09.03.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4387359 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04W72/12 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
H04L5/14 (EP);
H04L5/0044 (EP);
H04W72/04 (EP);
H04W72/0446 (EP);
H04W72/0453 (EP);
H04W72/12 (EP);
H04W72/23 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2024/25] | English: | DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD AND COMMUNICATION APPARATUS | [2024/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION | [2024/25] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2024 | Translation filed | 11.03.2024 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2024 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |