Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
07.06.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] |
07.06.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] |
13.05.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
06.02.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.01.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.01.2024 | Change - representative | |
26.01.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.03.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.03.2023 | New entry: applicant or inventor |