EP4397487 - LCP EXTRUDED FILM, INSULATING MATERIAL FOR CIRCUIT BOARD, AND METAL FOIL CLAD LAMINATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Denka Company Limited 1-1 Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8338 / JP | [2024/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIZUKA, Ryota Tokyo 103-8338 / JP | 02 /
MASUDA, Yusuke Tokyo 103-8338 / JP | 03 /
OGAWA, Naoki Tokyo 103-8338 / JP | [2024/28] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [2024/28] | Application number, filing date | 22864684.0 | 01.09.2022 | [2024/28] | WO2022JP32930 | Priority number, date | JP20210144054 | 03.09.2021 Original published format: JP 2021144054 | [2024/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023033102 | Date: | 09.03.2023 | Language: | JA | [2023/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4397487 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/12, C08J5/18, B32B15/08, B29C48/21, B29C48/25, H05K1/03 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
B29C48/022 (EP);
B29C48/21 (EP,KR);
B29C48/0021 (KR);
B29C48/23 (EP);
B29D7/01 (EP,KR);
B32B15/08 (EP,KR);
B32B15/09 (EP);
B32B15/20 (EP);
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/12 (EP,KR);
B32B27/20 (EP);
B32B27/281 (EP);
B32B27/285 (EP);
B32B27/286 (EP);
B32B27/288 (EP);
B32B27/34 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B27/365 (EP);
B32B37/15 (KR);
C08J5/18 (EP,KR);
H05K1/03 (EP,KR);
B29C2791/001 (EP);
B29C2793/0063 (EP);
B29C2793/009 (EP);
B29C48/0011 (EP);
B29C48/0022 (EP);
B29C48/08 (EP);
B29C48/28 (EP);
B29C48/307 (EP);
B29C48/35 (EP);
B29C48/914 (EP);
B29K2105/0079 (EP);
B32B2250/40 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EXTRUDIERTE LCP-FOLIE, ISOLIERMATERIAL FÜR LEITERPLATTE UND METALLFOLIENKASCHIERTES LAMINAT | [2024/28] | English: | LCP EXTRUDED FILM, INSULATING MATERIAL FOR CIRCUIT BOARD, AND METAL FOIL CLAD LAMINATE | [2024/28] | French: | FILM EXTRUDÉ EN PCL, MATÉRIAU ISOLANT POUR CARTE DE CIRCUIT IMPRIMÉ, ET STRATIFIÉ PLAQUÉ DE FEUILLE MÉTALLIQUE | [2024/28] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2024 | Translation filed | 12.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 12.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH08302208 (UNITIKA CHEM KK); | [A]JP2017192875 (UNIV FUKUOKA, et al); | [A]JP2018154409 (TOYO SEIKAN GROUP HOLDINGS LTD); | [A]JP2019218485 (UNIV OSAKA, et al) | by applicant | JPS6331729 | JP2010221694 |