EP4397928 - ARGON TOWER FOR AIR SEPARATION DEVICE, AND AIR SEPARATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Taiyo Nippon Sanso Corporation 3-26, Koyama 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 142-8558 / JP | [2024/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIZAKI, Kazutoshi Tokyo 142-8558 / JP | 02 /
EGOSHI, Nobuaki Tokyo 142-8558 / JP | [2024/28] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2024/28] | Application number, filing date | 22864715.2 | 02.09.2022 | [2024/28] | WO2022JP33062 | Priority number, date | JP20210143359 | 02.09.2021 Original published format: JP 2021143359 | JP20220041534 | 16.03.2022 Original published format: JP 2022041534 | [2024/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023033133 | Date: | 09.03.2023 | Language: | JA | [2023/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4397928 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F25J3/04, F25J3/02, C01B23/00, B01D3/16 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
F25J3/04678 (EP);
B01D3/143 (EP);
C01B23/0052 (EP);
F25J3/04703 (EP);
F25J3/04721 (EP);
F25J3/04727 (EP);
F25J3/04878 (EP);
F25J3/04909 (EP);
F25J3/04927 (EP);
F25J2235/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARGONTURM FÜR LUFTTRENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND LUFTTRENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2024/28] | English: | ARGON TOWER FOR AIR SEPARATION DEVICE, AND AIR SEPARATION DEVICE | [2024/28] | French: | TOUR D'ARGON POUR DISPOSITIF DE SÉPARATION D'AIR ET DISPOSITIF DE SÉPARATION D'AIR | [2024/28] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2024 | Translation filed | 21.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH07155585 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2000249464 (NIPPON OXYGEN CO LTD); | [A]JP2004251569 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2010046616 (TAIYO NIPPON SANSO CORP); | [A]JP2010210151 (TAIYO NIPPON SANSO CORP); | [A]JP2020026898 (AIR LIQUIDE) | by applicant | JP2000337766 | JP2011206681 | JP2016059888 | JP6257656B |