EP4395560 - SILAGE INOCULANTS FOR INHIBITION OF ACETOBACTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. 7100 N.W. 62nd Avenue P.O. Box 1014 Johnston, Iowa 50131-1014 / US | [2024/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENNIS, Scott Michael URBANDALE, Iowa 50322 / US | 02 /
IIAMS, John C JOHNSTON, Iowa 50131-0552 / US | 03 /
MAHANNA, William C JOHNSTON, Iowa 50131-0552 / US | 04 /
SMILEY, Brenda JOHNSTON, Iowa 50131-0552 / US | [2024/28] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2024/28] | Application number, filing date | 22865696.3 | 29.08.2022 | [2024/28] | WO2022US75563 | Priority number, date | US202163238388P | 30.08.2021 Original published format: US 202163238388 P | [2024/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023034734 | Date: | 09.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4395560 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A23K30/15, A23K50/10, A23K50/45 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
A23K30/15 (EP);
A23K50/10 (EP);
A23K50/20 (EP);
A23K50/30 (EP);
A23K50/75 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SILAGEIMPFSTOFFE ZUR HEMMUNG VON ACETOBACTER | [2024/28] | English: | SILAGE INOCULANTS FOR INHIBITION OF ACETOBACTER | [2024/28] | French: | INOCULANTS D'ENSILAGE PERMETTANT L'INHIBITION D'ACETOBACTER | [2024/28] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2024 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2024 | Search fee paid | 12.03.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2015134254 (PIONEER HI BRED INT [US]); | [A]US2018007933 (OWENS FREDRIC [US], et al); |