Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
02.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.04.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] |
05.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] |
05.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] |
08.11.2023 | Change - representative | |
14.07.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
14.07.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
12.07.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.07.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.07.2023 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
27.03.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.03.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.03.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.03.2023 | Change - representative | |
17.03.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication |