EP4376544 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE, METHOD, AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM FOR OBTAINING INFORMATION ABOUT BASE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNG, Euichang Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Hyoungjoo Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Jinwoo Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
YANG, Minho Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 05 /
LEE, Sanggeun Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 06 /
LEE, Juhyun Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 07 /
LIM, Chaiman Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/22] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2024/22] | Application number, filing date | 22867522.9 | 04.07.2022 | [2024/22] | WO2022KR09604 | Priority number, date | KR20210120704 | 09.09.2021 Original published format: KR 20210120704 | KR20210137594 | 15.10.2021 Original published format: KR 20210137594 | [2024/22] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023038253 | Date: | 16.03.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4376544 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W88/06, H04W24/08, H04W24/10, H04W76/27, H04W76/10, H04W8/22 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
H04B17/328 (EP,US);
H04W76/27 (EP,US);
H04B17/382 (EP);
H04W24/10 (US);
H04W48/16 (EP);
H04W74/0833 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM ZUM ERHALT VON INFORMATIONEN ÜBER EINE BASISSTATION | [2024/22] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE, METHOD, AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM FOR OBTAINING INFORMATION ABOUT BASE STATION | [2024/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE, PROCÉDÉ ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR POUR OBTENIR DES INFORMATIONS CONCERNANT UNE STATION DE BASE | [2024/22] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2024 | Translation filed | 22.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 22.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR20170020234 (ELECTRONICS & TELECOMMUNICATIONS RES INST [KR]); | [A]KR101950791B (SK TELECOM CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2020323032 (KIM JUNSUK [KR], et al); | [A]KR20200145829 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]KR20210034187 (LG UPLUS CORP [KR]) |