EP4215794 - FOLDABLE STAND AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 12.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honor Device Co., Ltd. Suite 3401, Unit A, Building 6 Shum Yip Sky Park, No. 8089 Hongli West Road Xiangmihu Street, Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | [2023/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Ling Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | 02 /
HUO, Guoliang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | 03 /
TANG, Feng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | 04 /
YANG, Desen Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | [2023/30] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/30] | Application number, filing date | 22868458.5 | 07.09.2022 | [2023/30] | WO2022CN117536 | Priority number, date | CN202111478155 | 06.12.2021 Original published format: CN202111478155 | [2023/30] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023103494 | Date: | 15.06.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4215794 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.06.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F16M11/38, F16M13/00, G06F3/02, F16M11/06, F16M11/20, F16M11/04 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
G06F3/0202 (EP,CN);
F16M11/38 (EP,CN,US);
F16C11/04 (CN);
F16C11/10 (CN,US);
F16C11/12 (CN);
F16M11/041 (EP);
F16M11/06 (EP);
F16M11/2007 (EP);
F16M13/00 (EP);
F16M13/005 (CN);
G06F1/1616 (US);
G06F3/0227 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/30] | F16M11/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FALTBARER STÄNDER UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/30] | English: | FOLDABLE STAND AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS | [2023/30] | French: | SUPPORT PLIABLE ET APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/30] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2023 | Translation filed | 24.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/30] | 09.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2001055196 (ANZAI MASATO [JP], et al); | [XA]JP2020043527 (KOKUYO KK) |