Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
12.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
13.04.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
12.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
12.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.06.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
23.06.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
19.06.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.06.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.06.2023 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
05.04.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
25.03.2023 | Change - representative | |
25.03.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication |