Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024183487 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022CN117536 | 07.09.2022 | CN202111478155 | 06.12.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4215794 | Global Dossier | 15.05.2024 | A4 | EP4215794 | 26.07.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022CN117536 | 07.09.2022 | CN202111478155 | 06.12.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2023103494 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2023 | A9 | WO2023103494 | 15.06.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202111478155 | 06.12.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113898851B | Global Dossier | 08.02.2022 | B | CN113898851 | 07.01.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202111478155 | 06.12.2021 |