EP4293783 - NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY, AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution Ltd. Tower 1, 108 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu 07335 Seoul / KR | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Sol Ji Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Jung Hoon Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Chul Haeng Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
KANG, Yoo Sun Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
LEE, Jae Won Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/51] | Application number, filing date | 22870274.2 | 14.09.2022 | [2023/51] | WO2022KR13726 | Priority number, date | KR20210122326 | 14.09.2021 Original published format: KR 20210122326 | [2023/51] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023043190 | Date: | 23.03.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4293783 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.03.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/0567, H01M10/0525, // H01M4/505, H01M4/525 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M10/0567 (EP,US);
C07F9/5428 (US);
H01M10/0568 (US);
H01M10/0569 (US);
H01M4/505 (EP,US);
H01M4/525 (EP,US);
H01M2004/028 (US);
H01M2300/0037 (US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/51] | H01M10/0567, H01M10/052, H01M4/525, H01M4/505 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASSERFREIER ELEKTROLYT FÜR LITHIUMSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND LITHIUMSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE DAMIT | [2023/51] | English: | NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY, AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY COMPRISING SAME | [2023/51] | French: | ÉLECTROLYTE NON AQUEUX POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM, ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM LE COMPRENANT | [2023/51] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2023 | Translation filed | 11.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 11.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/51] | 27.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]KR20150092271 (ESIONIC CORP [US]); | International search | [A]KR20150092271 (ESIONIC CORP [US]); | [A]KR20160100964 (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [A]JP6430365B ; | [A]KR20210052812 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20210061865 (J2H BIOTECH CO LTD [KR], et al) | by applicant | KR20210122326 |