Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20240102947 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022US76522 | 16.09.2022 | US202163245499 | 17.09.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL311039 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022US76522 | 16.09.2022 | US202163245499 | 17.09.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN118339182 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022US76522 | 16.09.2022 | US202163245499 | 17.09.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3231006 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022US76522 | 16.09.2022 | US202163245499 | 17.09.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2022347432 | Global Dossier | 14.03.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022US76522 | 16.09.2022 | US202163245499 | 17.09.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4377360 | Global Dossier | 05.06.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022US76522 | 16.09.2022 | US202163245499 | 17.09.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2024003355 | 11.06.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022US76522 | 16.09.2022 | US202163245499 | 17.09.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2023044402 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202163245499 | 17.09.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW202325734 | 01.07.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US202163245499 | 17.09.2021 |