EP4391480 - MULTICAST MESSAGE PROCESSING METHOD AND RELATED APPARATUS AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | 24.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GENG, Xuesong Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LI, Zhenbin Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
XIE, Jingrong Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/26] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2024/26] | Application number, filing date | 22871455.6 | 01.06.2022 | [2024/26] | WO2022CN96544 | Priority number, date | CN202111134664 | 27.09.2021 Original published format: CN202111134664 | CN202111223552 | 20.10.2021 Original published format: CN202111223552 | [2024/26] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023045394 | Date: | 30.03.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4391480 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L45/16 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
H04L45/16 (EP,US);
H04L45/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTICAST-NACHRICHTENVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN SOWIE ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG UND VORRICHTUNG | [2024/26] | English: | MULTICAST MESSAGE PROCESSING METHOD AND RELATED APPARATUS AND DEVICE | [2024/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE MESSAGE DE MULTIDIFFUSION ET APPAREIL ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉS | [2024/26] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2024 | Translation filed | 21.03.2024 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2024 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN104811387 (CISCO TECH INC); | [A]CN106603413 (ZTE CORP); | [A]US2018343137 (VAN DE VELDE GUNTER [BE], et al); | [A]CN110417657 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); |